H.R. No. 1464 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, A full and productive life drew to a close with the passing of James Rutledge Mason of Waxahachie on March 31, 2011, at the age of 96; and WHEREAS, Born in Biardstown in Lamar County on July 13, 1914, Mr. Mason was the son of Luther Emerson Mason and Lila Mae Mason; he graduated from Paris High School in 1931 and attended Paris Junior College before completing his bachelor's degree in business administration at The University of Texas at Austin; on June 1, 1940, he married the former Dora Frances Whitehead, and they later became the parents of two children, James and Lila Jean; Mr. and Mrs. Mason shared a fulfilling relationship of more than 60 years before her passing in 2001; and WHEREAS, Mr. Mason served his country in the United States Army during World War II; a sergeant (E-5), he was stationed in the Pacific theater and landed on Okinawa on April 3, 1945; he served there until the end of the war and received numerous commendations, among them the Rifle and Carbine Expert Medal, the World War II Victory Medal, and the Asiatic-Pacific Campaign Medal with two battle stars for the Philippines and Okinawa campaigns; and WHEREAS, A distinguished member of the banking industry for four decades, Mr. Mason began his career as a teller at Paris National Bank in 1936; he was later employed by Liberty State Bank and National City Bank in Dallas; after earning his graduate certificate from the American Institute of Banking with a major in investments in 1955, he went on to receive his diploma with the first graduating class of the Southwestern Graduate School of Banking at Southern Methodist University; he retired in 1976 as vice president of Republic National Bank of Dallas; and WHEREAS, This civic-minded Texan was deeply committed to his community; in addition to volunteering for Meals on Wheels, the Baylor Hospital of Waxahachie Auxiliary, and Pleasant Manor Living Center, he supported such charities as the Salvation Army, the USO, and Mothers Against Drunk Driving, and he and his wife worked together with great energy and dedication in behalf of political campaigns; moreover, Mr. Mason was a valued member of Central Presbyterian Church and served his faith as a Sunday school teacher, member of the session, and treasurer; he was also a life member of the American Legion and Veterans of Foreign Wars; his hobbies included fishing and hunting, and he was a charter fan of the Texas Rangers; and WHEREAS, James Mason made a positive difference in the lives of others, and those who were privileged to share in his love and friendship will forever treasure their memories of his kindness, compassion, and devotion; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of James Rutledge Mason and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his son, Captain James Rutledge Mason, Jr., (United States Navy, Retired), and his wife, Martha; to his daughter, Lila Jean Mason Blackwell, and her husband, Garry; to his grandchildren, James Rutledge Mason III, Garry W. Blackwell, Jr., Jennifer Gail Chauncey, Stephen Mason Blackwell, and Jeffrey Malvin Blackwell; to his great-grandchildren, Reagan, Reeves, Jessica, and Thatcher Blackwell, James Rutledge Mason IV and William Mason, and Brooke, Mason, and Parker Chauncey; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of James Rutledge Mason. Pitts ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1464 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 12, 2011. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House