House | 05/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#950 | Journal Page: 3542 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3542 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3537 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2650 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 2254 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Filed |