House | 05/21/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4191 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4191 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2254 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Filed |