House | 05/06/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2804 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2804 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2254 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Filed |