House | 05/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2923 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2380 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Filed |