House | 05/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3660 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3660 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2789 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Filed |