Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR1799 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R22589 MMS-D
 By: Parker H.R. No. 1799


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Among the early Anglo settlers of Texas who took
 part in the struggle for independence and in the work of developing
 the new republic were members of the related Zumwalt, Kent, and
 Burket families; and
 WHEREAS, Six of these interconnected families arrived in
 Texas from Missouri in about 1830 and settled in DeWitt's Colony,
 located in what is now Gonzales, Lavaca, DeWitt, Guadalupe, and
 Caldwell Counties; notable among their members were "Black" Adam
 Zumwalt, his brother-in-law Andrew Kent, his cousin "Red" Adam
 Zumwalt, and another relative, David Burket; and
 WHEREAS, Before the Texas Revolution, "Black" Adam Zumwalt
 and his family lived in the Gonzales area, and in the late spring of
 1835, Mr. Zumwalt attended the organizational meeting of the
 Gonzales Committee of Safety and Correspondence; the following
 October, he and his son Andrew took part in what is considered to be
 the first skirmish of the Texas Revolution; known as the Battle of
 Gonzales, the confrontation saw colonists repel a Mexican force
 sent out from San Antonio to retrieve a cannon that had earlier been
 lent to them for their protection against the Indians; on February
 1, 1836, Mr. Zumwalt participated in the election of delegates to
 the Convention of 1836, which adopted the Texas Declaration of
 Independence, and after the fall of the Alamo on March 6, 1836,
 General Sam Houston appointed him to manage the evacuation of
 families living along the Lavaca River; while Mr. Zumwalt was
 engaged in that duty, his son Andrew participated in the Battle of
 San Jacinto; "Black" Adam Zumwalt subsequently served in the Texas
 Army from June 6 to September 6, 1836; and
 WHEREAS, After his return to the Gonzales area in 1837, Mr.
 Zumwalt moved his family to a site in present-day Lavaca County that
 became known as Zumwalt Settlement; elected captain of a militia
 company, a post he held for some eight years, he took part in
 various punitive expeditions against groups of marauding Indians,
 including the large force that carried out the Linnville Raid of
 1840; he also fought in the Battle of Salado Creek, an engagement
 that took place on September 18, 1842, between Texas forces led by
 Mathew Caldwell and Mexican troops under the command of General
 Adrian Woll, who had just seized San Antonio; in that encounter the
 Texans prevailed, and General Woll withdrew to Mexico; and
 WHEREAS, Sometime during the 1850s, Mr. Zumwalt moved to
 Fayette County, where he became associated with the settlements of
 Cistern, Plum or Elm Grove, and Slack's Well; he died in Fayette
 County on July 11, 1872; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Zumwalt's brother-in-law Andrew Kent took
 possession of a league of land on the west bank of the Lavaca River;
 he fought in the Battle of Gonzales, alongside his son David, and
 later participated in electing delegates to the Convention of 1836;
 on February 27, 1836, he joined some 30 other members of the
 Gonzales Ranging Company of Mounted Volunteers and set off to aid
 the Texas troops besieged in the Alamo, where he perished during
 General Santa Anna's final assault on the fort; and
 WHEREAS, "Red" Adam Zumwalt settled with his family in
 Gonzales, where he built a residence that also served as a boarding
 house/hotel and restaurant; the establishment was located on St.
 James Street, across from the municipal plaza; Mr. Zumwalt also
 voted in the election that chose delegates to the Convention of
 1836, and he assisted in evacuating Gonzales-area families during
 the Runaway Scrape; by 1837 or 1838 he and his family had returned
 to Gonzales, which General Houston had ordered his men to burn, and
 began to rebuild their lives; Mr. Zumwalt is believed to have
 provided shelter and meals to many other returning settlers while
 they were in the midst of erecting their new homes; "Red" Adam
 Zumwalt also held title to a league of land north of Gonzales on the
 San Marcos River, where he developed a farm and ranch; he died there
 on March 9, 1853; and
 WHEREAS, David Burket, who married into the extended Zumwalt
 family, settled initially on property adjacent to Gonzales; he is
 thought to have helped organize the Gonzales Committee of Safety
 and Correspondence, and he subsequently voted for delegates to the
 Convention of 1836; in the wake of General Santa Anna's victory at
 the Alamo, he joined "Red" Adam Zumwalt in overseeing the exodus of
 families from the Gonzales area; after returning to Gonzales in
 1838, he settled with his family south of town, on the Guadalupe
 River; Mr. Burket died on December 7, 1845; and
 WHEREAS, The lives of these pioneer settlers are a vivid
 reminder of the remarkable fortitude that enabled Texans of that
 era to persevere in the face of extreme hardship and danger, and
 their contributions and sacrifice are indeed deserving of
 commemoration; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of "Black" Adam
 Zumwalt, Andrew Kent, "Red" Adam Zumwalt, and David Burket for the
 roles they played at one of the most fateful junctures in the
 history of Texas.