H.R. No. 1799 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Among the early Anglo settlers of Texas who took part in the struggle for independence and in the work of developing the new republic were members of the related Zumwalt, Kent, and Burket families; and WHEREAS, Six of these interconnected families arrived in Texas from Missouri in about 1830 and settled in DeWitt's Colony, located in what is now Gonzales, Lavaca, DeWitt, Guadalupe, and Caldwell Counties; notable among their members were "Black" Adam Zumwalt, his brother-in-law Andrew Kent, his cousin "Red" Adam Zumwalt, and another relative, David Burket; and WHEREAS, Before the Texas Revolution, "Black" Adam Zumwalt and his family lived in the Gonzales area, and in the late spring of 1835, Mr. Zumwalt attended the organizational meeting of the Gonzales Committee of Safety and Correspondence; the following October, he and his son Andrew took part in what is considered to be the first skirmish of the Texas Revolution; known as the Battle of Gonzales, the confrontation saw colonists repel a Mexican force sent out from San Antonio to retrieve a cannon that had earlier been lent to them for their protection against the Indians; on February 1, 1836, Mr. Zumwalt participated in the election of delegates to the Convention of 1836, which adopted the Texas Declaration of Independence, and after the fall of the Alamo on March 6, 1836, General Sam Houston appointed him to manage the evacuation of families living along the Lavaca River; while Mr. Zumwalt was engaged in that duty, his son Andrew participated in the Battle of San Jacinto; "Black" Adam Zumwalt subsequently served in the Texas Army from June 6 to September 6, 1836; and WHEREAS, After his return to the Gonzales area in 1837, Mr. Zumwalt moved his family to a site in present-day Lavaca County that became known as Zumwalt Settlement; elected captain of a militia company, a post he held for some eight years, he took part in various punitive expeditions against groups of marauding Indians, including the large force that carried out the Linnville Raid of 1840; he also fought in the Battle of Salado Creek, an engagement that took place on September 18, 1842, between Texas forces led by Mathew Caldwell and Mexican troops under the command of General Adrian Woll, who had just seized San Antonio; in that encounter the Texans prevailed, and General Woll withdrew to Mexico; and WHEREAS, Sometime during the 1850s, Mr. Zumwalt moved to Fayette County, where he became associated with the settlements of Cistern, Plum or Elm Grove, and Slack's Well; he died in Fayette County on July 11, 1872; and WHEREAS, Mr. Zumwalt's brother-in-law Andrew Kent took possession of a league of land on the west bank of the Lavaca River; he fought in the Battle of Gonzales, alongside his son David, and later participated in electing delegates to the Convention of 1836; on February 27, 1836, he joined some 30 other members of the Gonzales Ranging Company of Mounted Volunteers and set off to aid the Texas troops besieged in the Alamo, where he perished during General Santa Anna's final assault on the fort; and WHEREAS, "Red" Adam Zumwalt settled with his family in Gonzales, where he built a residence that also served as a boarding house/hotel and restaurant; the establishment was located on St. James Street, across from the municipal plaza; Mr. Zumwalt also voted in the election that chose delegates to the Convention of 1836, and he assisted in evacuating Gonzales-area families during the Runaway Scrape; by 1837 or 1838 he and his family had returned to Gonzales, which General Houston had ordered his men to burn, and began to rebuild their lives; Mr. Zumwalt is believed to have provided shelter and meals to many other returning settlers while they were in the midst of erecting their new homes; "Red" Adam Zumwalt also held title to a league of land north of Gonzales on the San Marcos River, where he developed a farm and ranch; he died there on March 9, 1853; and WHEREAS, David Burket, who married into the extended Zumwalt family, settled initially on property adjacent to Gonzales; he is thought to have helped organize the Gonzales Committee of Safety and Correspondence, and he subsequently voted for delegates to the Convention of 1836; in the wake of General Santa Anna's victory at the Alamo, he joined "Red" Adam Zumwalt in overseeing the exodus of families from the Gonzales area; after returning to Gonzales in 1838, he settled with his family south of town, on the Guadalupe River; Mr. Burket died on December 7, 1845; and WHEREAS, The lives of these pioneer settlers are a vivid reminder of the remarkable fortitude that enabled Texans of that era to persevere in the face of extreme hardship and danger, and their contributions and sacrifice are indeed deserving of commemoration; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of "Black" Adam Zumwalt, Andrew Kent, "Red" Adam Zumwalt, and David Burket for the roles they played at one of the most fateful junctures in the history of Texas. Parker ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1799 was adopted by the House on May 19, 2011, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House