House | 05/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 489 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 340 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |