Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR1927 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1927


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, April 21, 2011, marked the 22nd anniversary of the
 death of United States Army Colonel James Nicholas Rowe, and many
 residents of McAllen paused on that day to somberly reflect on his
 heroism and remarkable achievements; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Lee and Florence Rowe, "Nikki" Rowe was
 born in McAllen on February 8, 1938; he graduated from McAllen High
 School and the United States Military Academy at West Point; in
 1963, three months after he was posted to South Vietnam as a Special
 Forces advisor, he was taken prisoner in a firefight; he was held
 for five years under horrific conditions but remained strong and
 defiant, earning the nickname "Mr. Trouble" from his captors; on
 December 31, 1968, he became one of only 34 American prisoners of
 war to escape from the Viet Cong; and
 WHEREAS, Colonel Rowe applied for voluntary recall to active
 duty when he returned home and taught a POW-MIA planning and
 training program at Fort Bragg in North Carolina; in 1971, he
 published a bestselling, critically acclaimed account of his
 ordeal, Five Years to Freedom; he left the military in 1974, and he
 authored several other books before rejoining the army as a
 lieutenant colonel in 1981 to head its Green Beret training program
 at Fort Bragg; guided by his POW experiences, he developed and ran
 the Survival, Evasion, Resistance, and Escape program, known as
 SERE, which is used today by other branches of the military as well;
 and
 WHEREAS, From 1985 until 1987, Colonel Rowe commanded Fort
 Bragg's First Special Warfare Training Battalion; he was then
 appointed chief of the Army Division at the Joint United States
 Military Advisory Group headquarters in Quezon City, Philippines;
 on April 21, 1989, he was killed in an ambush on his way to work by
 members of the New Peoples' Army, a Communist rebel group; and
 WHEREAS, This courageous Texan was the recipient of numerous
 decorations, among them the Silver Star, the Legion of Merit, two
 Bronze Stars, and two Purple Hearts; he received myriad nonmilitary
 awards as well, including the American Patriot Award and George
 Washington Honor Medal from the Freedoms Foundation at Valley Forge
 and the Outstanding Young Man of America award; in McAllen, Second
 Street and VFW Post No. 2369 were renamed in his honor, and James
 Nikki Rowe High School also stands as a testament to the community's
 enduring pride in his accomplishments; and
 WHEREAS, Nikki Rowe's patriotism, valor, and iron
 determination remain a source of inspiration to all Americans, and
 through his leadership in creating the SERE program, he left an
 extraordinary legacy that continues to benefit members of our
 nation's military around the world; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature hereby honor the life of Colonel James "Nikki" Rowe and
 commemorate the 22nd anniversary of his death.
 Gonzales of Hidalgo
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1927 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 19, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House