House | 05/24/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4371 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4371 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 4198 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Filed |