House | 06/01/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/30/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6900 | |
House | 05/30/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6900 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 5775 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 5023 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Filed |