H.R. No. 2217 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories of Ina Mae Hardin Allen of McGregor, who passed away on April 19, 2011, at the age of 92; and WHEREAS, Born in Jarrell on February 28, 1919, to Joe and Mattie Hardin, the former Ina Mae Hardin was a descendant of the Hardin and Pickens pioneer families who moved to Texas from Tennessee in the 1830s; a self-sufficient and independent woman, she grew up during the Great Depression, an experience that fostered in her a respect for hard work, frugality, and a sense of social responsibility; and WHEREAS, Ina Mae Hardin wed James Allen on August 13, 1938, in Gatesville, and the couple enjoyed a rewarding marriage of 62 years, until his death on February 22, 2001; deeply devoted to her family, she was blessed with two children, Jimmy and Judy, as well as five grandchildren and four great-grandchildren; and WHEREAS, Mrs. Allen lived in the McGregor and Oglesby area for most of her life; a valued member of her community, she worshipped at the College Avenue Baptist Church; she enjoyed cooking for her family and traveling, as well as crochet and embroidery; and WHEREAS, A beloved mother, grandmother, and great-grandmother, Ina Mae Allen lived a caring and purposeful life, and those who shared in the warmth of her affection will forever hold her close to their hearts; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Ina Mae Allen and extend sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her son and daughter-in-law, Jimmy and Mary Allen; to her daughter and son-in-law, Judy and Frank Chaudoin; to her twin sister, Iva Jane Brown; to her grandchildren, Aubrey Chaudoin and his wife, Michelle, Tate Chaudoin, Jeffrey Allen, and Amy Allen; to her great-grandchildren, Hunter Chaudoin, Brooke Chaudoin, Bailey Allen, and Alexa LaPlace; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ina Mae Allen. Anderson of McLennan ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 2217 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 26, 2011. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House