Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR2232 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2232


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 death of Ross S. Tennison of Waco on April 13, 2011, at the age of
 80; and
 WHEREAS, Ross Tennison was born in West on September 6, 1930,
 to Charlie and Mary Tennison; he attended school in West before
 answering his nation's call to duty during World War II by enlisting
 in the U.S. Marine Corps; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Tennison wed the former Daisy Dee Sisk on
 November 11, 1948, and they shared 53 rewarding years together,
 until her passing on March 22, 2002; they were blessed with 3
 daughters, Edna, Doiline, and Linda, as well as 9 grandchildren, 10
 great-grandchildren, and 4 great-great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Tennison worked with the Union Pacific Railroad
 until 1970, when he retired due to an injury; he was a Master Mason
 with the Grand Lodge of Texas and Fort Worth Lodge No. 148, as well
 as a member of Shriners International; in his free time he enjoyed
 traveling and riding horses; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Ross Tennison brings great
 sadness to his family and friends, he leaves behind a legacy that
 will long be treasured by all those who held him dear; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Ross S. Tennison and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 daughters and sons-in-law, Edna and Jimmy Robertson, Doiline and
 John Eatman, and Linda and Pat Fernandez; to his grandchildren,
 great-grandchildren, and great-great-grandchildren; and to his
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ross
 Tennison.
 Anderson of McLennan
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2232 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 26, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House