House | 05/19/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 4190 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 838 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 340 | |
House | 12/13/2010 | Filed |