H.R. No. 2599 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories of Joyce "Nena" Norsworthy Wailes of Waco, who passed away on April 28, 2011, at the age of 76; and WHEREAS, The former Joyce Evelyn Norsworthy was born in Sabine Parish, Louisiana, on December 7, 1934, to Henry and Annie Durrett Norsworthy; after attending college, she married Julian "Hap" Wailes, the love of her life, on June 4, 1954, in Natchitoches, Louisiana; they enjoyed 56 years together and were blessed with a daughter, Debbie; and WHEREAS, Mrs. Wailes and her family moved to Waco on May 1, 1972; she was a member of Timber Crest Baptist Church, where she served the congregation as church librarian; and WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to her family, Mrs. Wailes especially enjoyed spending time with her six grandchildren and 12 great-grandchildren; her favorite pastimes also included quilting and gardening; and WHEREAS, While the death of Nena Wailes brings great sadness to her family and friends, she leaves behind a legacy that will long be treasured by all those who held her dear; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Joyce Norsworthy Wailes and extend sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her husband, Julian "Hap" Wailes; to her daughter, Debbie Galvez; to her grandchildren, Kirstin Galvez-Leidig, Kenny Galvez and his wife, Angie, Geoffrey Galvez, Jamey Galvez, Jonathan Galvez, and Rachel Galvez; to her 12 great-grandchildren; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Joyce Norsworthy Wailes. Anderson of McLennan ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 2599 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 30, 2011. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House