Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR2793 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2793


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, In 2010 and 2011, the State of Texas lost a number of
 accomplished Texans, whose legacies live on through the loved ones
 and achievements they leave behind; and
 WHEREAS, Gone but forever remembered by those who knew them
 as devoted husbands, wives, fathers, mothers, grandparents,
 mentors, role models, and friends are the following individuals:
 Bruck Watkin Barrick, who passed away on July 12, 2010;
 Arturo Bocanegra, who passed away on April 1, 2011;
 Gilbert "Gil" Jesus Chavez, who passed away on December 11,
 2010;
 Juanita Contreras, who passed away on April 7, 2011;
 Maria Elena L. Espinosa, who passed away on October 23, 2010;
 Antonio "Tony" Garza, who passed away on March 27, 2011;
 Esteban "Steve" Jordan, who passed away on August 13, 2010;
 Antonio "Toney" Arturo Lopez, who passed away on August 28,
 2010;
 Apolinar Martinez, who passed away on April 25, 2010;
 Mario G. Obledo, who passed away on August 18, 2010;
 Juan Jose Patlan, who passed away on February 14, 2010;
 Refugia "Ruth" Mauricio Soto, who passed away on June 17,
 2010;
 Esperanza Trujillo, who passed away in October 2010;
 Dr. David Weber, who passed away on August 20, 2010; and
 Alfredo Zamora, who passed away in January 2010; and
 WHEREAS, Today, as we pause in remembrance of these esteemed
 men and women, we acknowledge the positive difference they made in
 the world during their years on this earth, and we honor their
 memories for the many ways they enhanced the communities in which
 they lived and worked; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Bruck Watkin
 Barrick, Arturo Bocanegra, Gilbert Jesus Chavez, Juanita
 Contreras, Maria Elena L. Espinosa, Antonio Garza, Esteban Jordan,
 Antonio Arturo Lopez, Apolinar Martinez, Mario G. Obledo, Juan Jose
 Patlan, Refugia Mauricio Soto, Esperanza Trujillo, Dr. David Weber,
 and Alfredo Zamora and extend deepest sympathy to all those who
 mourn their passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their families and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of these
 admirable Texans.
 Alonzo
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2793 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 30, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House