House | 05/05/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | RV#630 | Journal Page: 2688 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 574 | |
House | 02/07/2011 | Filed |