House | 03/15/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 606 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 606 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Filed |