House | 03/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 836 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 836 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 742 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 538 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |