House | 03/02/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 342 | |
House | 01/05/2011 | Filed |