House | 04/14/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 838 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 343 | |
House | 01/05/2011 | Filed |