House | 03/17/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 731 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 731 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 679 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Filed |