House | 03/22/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |