Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR759 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 759


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, March 6, 2011, marks the 175th anniversary of the
 fall of the Alamo, one of the most famous episodes in Texas history;
 and
 WHEREAS, On December 9, 1835, an army of Texas volunteers
 captured San Antonio de Bexar from a force of Mexican soldiers under
 the command of General Martin Perfecto de Cos; Lieutenant Colonel
 James Clinton Neill was then placed in command of the Alamo, which
 enjoyed a strategic position because of its location on one of the
 two main roads stretching from Mexico into Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Notwithstanding the small number of men in his
 command and a lack of provisions, Colonel Neill was determined to
 hold the Alamo; his troops were augmented slightly over the
 following weeks: Colonel James Bowie arrived with a detachment of
 30 men on January 19, 1836; Lieutenant Colonel William Barret
 Travis rode in at the head of 30 cavalrymen on February 3, and David
 Crockett and 12 other volunteers entered the fort on about February
 8; and
 WHEREAS, Colonel Neill left the Alamo in mid-February to help
 his family, which had been struck by illness, and command of the
 regular soldiers fell to Colonel Travis, while Colonel Bowie
 assumed command of the volunteers; and
 WHEREAS, On February 23, a Mexican army of about 6,000 men
 under the command of Antonio Lopez de Santa Anna reached San
 Antonio; after a demand for the fort's surrender was rejected with a
 cannon shot, the Mexican artillery began an assault on the Alamo's
 perimeter walls; and
 WHEREAS, The following day, February 24, Colonel Bowie fell
 seriously ill and command of the volunteers passed to Colonel
 Travis; facing terrible odds but committed to the mission before
 him, Travis penned a desperate plea for reinforcements; his letter,
 addressed "To the People of Texas and all Americans in the world,"
 pledged that he would "never surrender or retreat" and concluded
 with the defiant words "Victory or Death"; and
 WHEREAS, On March 1, while the siege continued, Lieutenant
 George Kimbell and a company of 32 soldiers slipped through the
 Mexican lines and joined the Alamo garrison; the large number of men
 that Travis hoped for, however, never arrived; finally, about 5
 a.m. on March 6, General Santa Anna sent some 1,800 assault troops
 surging toward the fort; within 90 minutes the battle was over, and
 the few surviving defenders were quickly executed; while the
 official list of Alamo soldiers who died numbers 189, the actual
 number may be as high as 257; the number of Mexican troops wounded
 or killed is estimated to have been about 600; and
 WHEREAS, The 13 days that General Santa Anna devoted to
 capturing the fort cost Mexico dearly; while he delayed his
 advance, the convention of Texas delegates meeting in
 Washington-on-the-Brazos had time to adopt a declaration of
 independence, draft a constitution, and form an interim government;
 moreover, news of the garrison's destruction fired the Texas army
 with a fierce resolve, and on April 21, 1836, the battlefield at San
 Jacinto echoed with cries of "Remember the Alamo"; and
 WHEREAS, Since those fateful days in 1836, the story of the
 Alamo has reached audiences around the world; the Alamo remains one
 of the state's most important historical landmarks, and the Alamo
 defenders who gave their lives within its walls will forever be
 honored for their gallantry and courageous sacrifice in the cause
 of freedom; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the fallen heroes of the Battle of
 the Alamo, whose immeasurable selflessness and bravery helped give
 rise to an independent Texas.
 Branch
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 759 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 17, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House