House | 05/09/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2922 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2922 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 789 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |