House | 04/07/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1488 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1488 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1164 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1114 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Filed |