Senate
|
04/15/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 54
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 54
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|