E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1717
|
Journal Page: 6666
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6666
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2684
|
Journal Page: 6665
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1249
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6234
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6234
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6277
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6277
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6277
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3700
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5450
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1429
|
Journal Page: 5450
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5450
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Burkett
|
Journal Page: 5449
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5449
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5275
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
5-Sheffield
|
Journal Page: 5275
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5274
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1386
|
Journal Page: 5274
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5272
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 212
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 212
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|