House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4185 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1122 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1122 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1122 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1122 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Carona | Journal Page: 1120 |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 553 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 553 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |