E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4223
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4223
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4223
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3121
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1276
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4721
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4721
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 4721
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4721
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1274
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|