House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3320 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3088 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1772 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1772 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1772 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1771 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1771 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1771 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1919 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |