Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1050 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West S.B. No. 1050
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the collection of certain information on a birth
 certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 192.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The section of the birth certificate entitled "For
 Medical and Health Use Only" is not part of the legal birth
 certificate. If the birth is the result of a labor induction or a
 cesarean section, the following information must be collected under
 that section of the birth certificate:
 (1)  whether the labor induction or cesarean section
 was performed before the 40th week of gestation; and
 (2)  whether the labor induction or cesarean section
 was medically indicated.
 (b-1)  Information held by the department under the [that]
 section of the certificate described by Subsection (b) is
 confidential. That information may not be released or made public
 on subpoena or otherwise, except that release may be made for
 statistical purposes only so that no person, patient, or facility
 is identified, or to medical personnel of a health care entity, as
 that term is defined in Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, or
 appropriate state or federal agencies for statistical research.
 The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission [board] may adopt rules to implement Subsection (b) and
 this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt any rules and the Department of State Health Services shall
 prescribe the form necessary to implement Section 192.002, Health
 and Safety Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Section 192.002, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies to the collection of information
 regarding a birth that occurs on or after January 1, 2012. The
 collection of information regarding a birth that occurred before
 that date is governed by the law in effect at the time of the birth,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *