Senate | 05/30/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 5148 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 557 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 557 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |