House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |