E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4010 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4525 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3576 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5421 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1405 | Journal Page: 5422 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 5422 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5422 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5410 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5410 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |