Senate | 04/28/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1274 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1274 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 788 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |