E
|
05/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
E
|
05/05/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1921
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#663
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2697
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#636
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2334
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1215
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1215
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1215
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1215
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 561
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 561
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|