E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6296
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1632
|
Journal Page: 6295
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6295
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2518
|
Journal Page: 6291
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1206
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3339
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3339
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4918
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4918
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2499
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2499
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2499
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2499
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2252
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3671
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#987
|
Journal Page: 3670
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3670
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3670
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 256
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 561
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 561
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|