House
|
05/23/2011
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4789
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4789
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4356
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 562
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 562
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|