House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/03/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |