E | 04/21/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/21/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1344 | |
E | 04/13/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1057 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1039 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#338 | Journal Page: 1676 |
House | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 245 | Journal Page: 1652 |
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 830 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 587 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |