House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3828 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 568 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 568 | |
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |