House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Patrick | Journal Page: 744 |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |