Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB117 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 117
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to allowing municipally owned utility systems in certain
 cities to fund a program to aid low-income residents in paying their
 bills.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 1502.056, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If the revenue of a utility system, park, or swimming
 pool secures the payment of public securities issued or obligations
 incurred under this chapter, each expense of operation and
 maintenance, including all salaries, labor, materials, interest,
 repairs and extensions necessary to provide efficient service, and
 each proper item of expense, is a first lien against that
 revenue.  For a municipality with a population of more than one
 million, the first lien against the revenue of a municipally owned
 [electric or gas] utility system that secures the payment of public
 securities issued or obligations incurred under this chapter also
 applies to funding, as a necessary operations expense, for a bill
 payment assistance program for utility system customers who have
 been threatened with disconnection from service for nonpayment of
 bills and who have been determined by the municipality to be
 low-income customers.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *