House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4617 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3828 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2264 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2264 | |
05/12/2011 | Record vote | |||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2264 | |
05/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | |||
05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |||
05/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |