Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1177 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1177
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1177 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the adoption by health care facilities of a policy on
 vaccine preventable diseases; imposing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subtitle A, Title 4, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE A.  FINANCING, CONSTRUCTING, REGULATING, AND INSPECTING
 HEALTH FACILITIES
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle A, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 224 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 224.  POLICY ON VACCINE PREVENTABLE DISEASES
 Sec. 224.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health care facility" means:
 (A)  a facility licensed under Subtitle B of this
 title, including a hospital as defined by Section 241.003; or
 (B)  a hospital maintained or operated by this
 state.
 (2)  "Employee" includes:
 (A)  an individual providing direct patient care
 pursuant to a contract with a health care facility; and
 (B)  an individual to whom a health care facility
 has granted privileges to provide direct patient care.
 (3)  "Regulatory authority" means a state agency that
 regulates a health care facility under this code.
 (4)  "Vaccine preventable diseases" means the diseases
 included in the most current recommendations of the Advisory
 Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease
 Control and Prevention.
 Sec. 224.002.  VACCINE PREVENTABLE DISEASES POLICY
 REQUIRED. (a)  Each health care facility shall develop and
 implement a policy to protect its patients from vaccine preventable
 diseases.
 (b)  The policy must:
 (1)  require the employees of the health care facility
 to receive vaccines for the vaccine preventable diseases specified
 by the facility based on the level of risk the employee presents to
 patients by the employee's routine and direct exposure to patients;
 (2)  specify the vaccines a health care facility
 employee is required to receive based on the level of risk the
 employee presents to patients by the employee's routine and direct
 exposure to patients;
 (3)  include procedures for verifying whether a health
 care facility employee has complied with the policy;
 (4)  include procedures for a health care facility
 employee to be exempt from the required vaccines for medical
 reasons;
 (5)  for a health care facility employee who is exempt
 from the required vaccines, include procedures the employee must
 follow to protect facility patients from exposure to disease, such
 as wearing a mask, based on the level of risk the employee presents
 to patients by the employee's routine and direct exposure to
 patients;
 (6)  require the health care facility to maintain a
 written or electronic record of each health care facility
 employee's compliance with or exemption from the policy; and
 (7)  include disciplinary actions the health care
 facility is authorized to take against a health care facility
 employee who fails to comply with the policy.
 (c)  The policy may include procedures for a health care
 facility employee to be exempt from the required vaccines based on
 reasons of conscience, including a religious belief.
 Sec. 224.003.  DISASTER EXEMPTION. (a)  In this section,
 "public health disaster" has the meaning assigned by Section
 81.003.
 (b)  During a public health disaster, a health care facility
 may prohibit an employee who is exempt from the vaccines required in
 the policy developed by the facility under Section 224.002 from
 having contact with facility patients.
 Sec. 224.004.  DISCIPLINARY ACTION. A health care facility
 that violates this chapter is subject to an administrative or civil
 penalty in the same manner, and subject to the same procedures, as
 if the facility had violated a provision of this code that
 specifically governs the facility.
 Sec. 224.005.  RULES. The appropriate rulemaking authority
 for each regulatory authority shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than June 1, 2012, a state agency that
 regulates a health care facility subject to Chapter 224, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, shall adopt the rules necessary
 to implement that chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Notwithstanding Chapter 224, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a health care facility subject to that
 chapter is not required to have a policy on vaccine preventable
 diseases in effect until September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *