E | 05/28/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2515 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2553 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2485 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Record vote | RV#1132 | Journal Page: 4072 |
House | 05/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4072 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4072 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 477 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |