E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB863
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 570
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 570
|
Senate
|
03/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|