E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/24/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5036 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3056 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3320 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2802 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#1185 | Journal Page: 4366 |
House | 05/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4366 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4366 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4356 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4356 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1503 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |